Committee
Executive Committee Members
Date : 16-01-2019
Name |
Designation |
Time Duration |
Dr. A. H. Gandhi |
President |
---- |
Mr. Vijay Radadiya |
Vice President |
01-01-2018 to 31-12-2020 |
Mrs. Vishruti V. Desai |
Secretary |
01-01-2018 to 31-12-2020 |
Mr. Ravi A Prajapati |
Member |
01-01-2018 to 31-12-2020 |
Mr. Parikshit Lathiya |
Member |
01-01-2018 to 31-12-2020 |
Mr. Sumit Y Patel |
Member |
01-01-2018 to 31-12-2020 |
Mr. Manan Shah |
Member |
01-01-2018 to 31-12-2020 |
Mr. Nilay J Vaghasiya |
Member |
01-01-2018 to 31-12-2020 |
Ms. Ekta Shah |
Member |
01-01-2018 to 31-12-2020 |
Mr. Movik Madhawani |
Member |
01-01-2018 to 31-12-2020 |
Mr. Robin Hojiwala |
Member |
01-01-2018 to 31-12-2020 |
Mr. Ritesh M Patel (PG) |
Member |
01-01-2019 to 31-12-2020 |
Mr. Prem Popatiya |
Member |
01-01-2019 to 31-12-2020 |
Mr. Jigar Shethiya |
Member |
01-01-2019 to 31-12-2020 |